MONARCH'S MUTTS DOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR DOGS, IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY PLACING SUCH ANIMALS INTO FOSTER HOMES OR MAINTAINING A RESCUE CENTER OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF THE ANIMALS, SEEKING TO SUITABLY REHOME THEM, AND TAKING REASONABLE STEPS TO ENSURE THEY REMAIN IN THEIR NEW HOME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
lucy Antill | Chair | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
michelle cooper | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Peace BSc | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
kathleen Antill | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.54k | £58.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.15k | £54.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR DOGS, IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY PLACING SUCH ANIMALS INTO FOSTER HOMES OR MAINTAINING A RESCUE CENTER OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF THE ANIMALS, SEEKING TO SUITABLY REHOME THEM, AND TAKING REASONABLE STEPS TO ENSURE THEY REMAIN IN THEIR NEW HOME BY OFFERING SUPPORT AND GUIDANCE TO THE OWNERS. (2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR DOGS BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL AND DOG WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Alison Road
HALESOWEN
B62 0AT
- Phone:
- 07534954992
- Email:
- monarchsmutts@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window