YOUTH ASSOCIATION SOUTH YORKSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to deliver services of social education advice and training that enhance the lives of young peple and their communities across South Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £44,573 from 3 government contract(s) and £14,062 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 22 April 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN MARGARET ATKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Anthony Liam Olaseinde | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Davinder Kaur El-Harti | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Walker | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jamelle Ola | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES IBBERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.15k | £208.26k | £235.58k | £132.18k | £150.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £274.37k | £217.09k | £185.77k | £172.48k | £170.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £111.37k | £107.36k | £105.53k | £77.84k | £44.57k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.42k | £14.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 309 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 309 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/04/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/04/2015
Charitable objects
3.2.1 TO PROMOTE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD ELSEWHERE AND IN PARTICULAR TO HELP EDUCATE THEM THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; 3.2.2 TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS PROVIDED THAT: 3.2.2.1 IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
YASY Works
10a Carver Street
Sheffield
S1 4FS
- Phone:
- 01142755309
- Email:
- info@yasy.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window