CBA YORKSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Archaeology in Yorkshire. Provide advice and assistance to individuals and community groups with an interest in archaeology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 December 1987: Standard registration
- CBA GROUP 4 (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Paxton Buglass MA MCIfA | Chair | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Claxton | Trustee | 06 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Denis Brian Waudby BA MA PhD | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fedor Kiyanenko | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Abramson MA, FSA | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Josephine Heron | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY THUBRON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.21k | £4.06k | £2.88k | £5.90k | £3.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.13k | £569 | £3.29k | £5.75k | £3.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED ON THE 3 FEBRUARY 1996. as amended on 05 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ARCHAEOLOGY B) TO ADVANCE AND ASSIST RESEARCH C) TO PROVIDE A FRAMEWORK FOR COMMUNICATION AND DISCISSION, AND TO BE A VEHICLE FOR REPRESENTATION TO THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND TO THE CBA OF ANY CONSENSUS WHICH EMERGES D) TO PROVIDE INFORMATION E) TO ENCOURAGE WIDESPREAD PARTICIPATION IN ARCHAEOLOGY THROUGHOUT SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Council For British Archaeology
92 Micklegate
YORK
YO1 6JX
- Phone:
- 01904 341276
- Website:
-
cba-yorkshire.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window