FEED THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Feed the Community operates food bank in an area of Grimsby that has high unemployment and lots of low income families. We fundraise to purchase store cupboard basics and work with local supermarkets, collecting unsold but still perfectly edible food, providing people in need, sufficient food to last 3-4 days. Each client is assessed on an individual basis and no one is turned away if in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 October 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 14 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lacey Langridge | Chair | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Perrin-Tweedy | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Evelyn Abey | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Brown | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Williams | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/10/2022 | 25/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.57k | £26.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.17k | £7.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 October 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 October 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, AND; B. SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Feed the community donation centre
211 Grimsby Road
CLEETHORPES
DN35 7HB
- Phone:
- 07727260285
- Email:
- feedthecommunity@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window