COOKING UP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cooking Up aims to advance the health and wellbeing of people facing challenging circumstances in the London Borough of Richmond and surrounding boroughs by teaching them to cook health, tasty food for themselves and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 20 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Hilton | Chair | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexia Maycock | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Mare Botha | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Marozzi | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Harrison - Church | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.46k | £32.32k | £43.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45k | £5.14k | £30.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £20.39k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEATH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE FACING FOOD POVERTY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS, BY TEACHING THEM HOW TO COOK LOW COST HEALTHY MEALS FOR THEMSELVES AND THEIR FAMILIES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quillpoint Accountancy Services
Ty Menter Navigation Park
Abercynon
Mountain Ash
CF45 4SN
- Phone:
- 078410 24085
- Email:
- info@cookingup.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window