TOY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ensuring children in the area of HP4 and HP23 postcodes whose families are suffering financial hardship receive presents at Christmas time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,925 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Young | Chair | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Abercromby | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Francis | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Mitchell | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hardy | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.24k | £10.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.19k | £9.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.10k | £2.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN THE BERKHAMSTED AND TRING AREA OF THE UK FOR THE PARENTS AND GUARDIANS AFFECTED BY FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BEFORE CHRISTMAS, BY PROVIDING FREE CHRISTMAS PRESENTS FOR THEIR CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 GAVESTON DRIVE
BERKHAMSTED
HP4 1JF
- Phone:
- 07825270896
- Email:
- hello@toyhub.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window