Accounts and annual returns THE BRUCE BURNS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 519607
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 June 2007 02 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 June 2007 Not Required
Annual return 10 June 2006 13 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 10 June 2005 30 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 June 2005 Not Required
Annual return 10 June 2004 18 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 June 2004 Not Required