ALK+ INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ALK International is patient and family-led, created with a single mission:To improve the life expectancy for ALK positive cancer patients.We do this by:Fundraising;drive the most vital research for ALK by providing grants for projects/clinical trials.Advocating;improvements to treatment/clinical trial availablity for patients and help accelerate lifesaving ALK advances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 July 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Gibbard | Chair | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Goddard | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Jonathan | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Gibbard | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.20k | £55.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £48.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PATIENTS WITH ANAPLASTIC LYMPHOMA KINASE POSITIVE (ALK+) CANCER IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A. AWARDING GRANTS FOR RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION AND CURE FOR ALK CANCER, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED. B. WORKING WITH OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS TO CREATE CAMPAIGNS THAT WILL RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF ALK CANCER; C. ADVOCATING FOR IMPROVEMENTS TO TREATMENT AND CLINICAL TRIAL AVAILABILITY, BY LIAISING WITH GOVERNMENT, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, REGULATORY BODIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS; D. IDENTIFYING AND LOCATING ALK PATIENTS AND OFFERING THEM INFORMATION AND SUPPORT; E. THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES SUCH AS A WEBSITE AND SOCIAL MEDIA SUPPORT GROUPS THAT WILL CONNECT PATIENTS AND EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND KEEP THEM INFORMED OF THE MOST UP-TO-DATE DEVELOPMENTS ON THE ADVANCEMENT OF TREATMENTS AND RESEARCH, AND; F. RAISING FUNDS FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Northfield
Hartley
LONGFIELD
Kent
DA3 7EW
- Phone:
- 07712573731
- Email:
- admin@alkinternational.org
- Website:
-
ALKINTERNATIONAL.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window