FARNDALE AGRICULTURAL, HORTICULTURAL AND INDUSTRIAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Dales Agricultural, Horticultural and Industrial Show, exhibits of livestock, farm produce, etc; the event is open to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £3,521 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 08 January 1988: Standard registration
- FARNDALE SHOW (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MURIEL TINSLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Aconley | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
gillian kylie little | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE FEATHERSTONE | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.39k | £258 | £1 | £18.35k | £22.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.46k | £2.23k | £1.65k | £17.41k | £22.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 09 October 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 21 October 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 DECEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURE BY HOLDING AND ANNUAL AGRICULTURAL SHOW IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA FOR THE EXHIBITION OF FARMING STOCK, IMPLEMENTS AND PRODUCE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE BREEDING OF LIVESTOCK AND PROMOTING THE ADOPTION OF IMPROVED METHODS OF FARMING.(B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE RURAL CRAFTS. (C) TO ENCOURAGE AGRICULTURAL EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
FARNDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Duffin Stone
Farndale
Kirkbymoorside
YORK
YO62 7LA
- Phone:
- 01751430885
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window