CANCER UK-SALONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to bridge the care gap, relieve sickness, and preserve health amongst vulnerable and underprivileged people battling with cancer in deprived England communities and Sierra Leone (West Africa). Advocacy, Education, Support, Capacity Building and Protection of Well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 11 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AUGUSTINE THOMAS | Chair | 11 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA STANKOVIC | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
RAJIV BENDRE OBE | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TINA DAVIES O.B.E | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr LEONARD GORDON-HARRIS | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.83k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 23 March 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 15 February 2025 | 375 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 May 2022
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONGST VULNERABLE AND UNDERPRIVILEGED PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM CANCER IN DEPRIVED LONDON (ENGLAND) COMMUNITIES AND SIERRA LEONE (WEST AFRICA) BY: I. ASSISTING TO PROVIDE PALLIATIVE CARE DRUGS WHEN NOT FREELY AVAILABLE IN DEPRIVED COMMUNITIES II. PROVIDING PSYCHOSOCIAL SUPPORT INCLUDING COUNSELLING AND SIGNPOSTING TO APPROPRIATE LOCAL ORGANISATIONS. 2. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF CANCER IN SIERRA LEONE (WEST AFRICA) AND LONDON (ENGLAND) ETHNIC MINORITY COMMUNITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION, AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. TO PROVIDE SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES IN SIERRA LEONE (WEST AFRICA). 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CANCER BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, FORA AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF NEWSLETTERS, DEVOTED TO CANCER, HEALTH AND WELL-BEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29A YORK ROAD
WALTHAM CROSS
29A
YORK ROAD
EN8 7HJ
- Phone:
- 07949401836
- Email:
- tdavies@canceruksalone.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window