FISHGUARD AND GOODWICK CAT AND DOG RESCUE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise monies to help the needy pay vets fees for treatment / operations & vaccinations of pets in their care. Make regular donations and food supplies to Animal Sanctuaries to help in the up keep of unwanted animals that come into their care whilst looking for new homes for them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 29 February 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Davenport | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Marilyn Millard | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Cottrell | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY BENNETT-HOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.33k | £19.55k | £22.80k | £25.52k | £28.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.33k | £20.18k | £19.93k | £16.52k | £18.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 March 2024 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 26 JUNE 1985 AMENDED 11 NOVEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONGST CATS AND DOGS BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD SHELTER AND VETERINARY TREATMENT FOR SUCH ANIMALS THAT ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH MATTERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE FISHGUARD AND GOODWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Animal Welfare
Market Square
FISHGUARD
Dyfed
SA65 9HA
- Phone:
- 07733203494
- Email:
- aida1@uwclub.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window