UNIARK CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UniArk provides free admission support to students from persecuted/vulnerable communities. Our support includes personalised feedback on the admission application as well providing small grants to our students where necessary to remove financial barriers. These grants include admission related costs such as English tests which are too expensive for some of our students from developing countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 24 May 2022: CIO registration
- UNIARK CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shukria Rezaei | Chair | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Goncalo Araujo Regado | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Najib Sharifi | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.28k | £17.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.38k | £25.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 3.1.1 PROVIDING GENERAL ACADEMIC ADVICE AND IN PARTICULAR, ANY GUIDANCE, ADVICE OR WORK DONE RELATING TO UNIVERSITY APPLICATIONS WHICH INCLUDE (WITHOUT LIMITATION) PROVIDING INTERVIEW PRACTICES AND FEEDBACK ON PERSONAL STATEMENTS AND ASSISTING ON THE PREPARATION FOR ADMISSIONS TESTS AND SCHOLARSHIP APPLICATIONS; AND 3.1.2 AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SUBSIDIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS ASSOCIATED OR IN CONNECTION WITH THEIR UNIVERSITY APPLICATION PROCESS, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION): (A) APPLICATION FEES FOR ADMISSIONS APTITUDE TESTS (SUCH AS, AMONGST OTHERS, THE BIOMEDICAL ADMISSIONS TEST (BMAT), MATHEMATICS ADMISSIONS TEST (MAT), NATIONAL ADMISSIONS TEST FOR LAW (LNAT), SIXTH TERM EXAMINATION PAPER (STEP) AND UNIVERSITY CLINICAL APTITUDE TEST (UCAT)), AND (B) SHALL INCLUDE THE TRAVELLING OR TRANSPORTATION FEES INCURRED FOR THE PURPOSE OF TAKING SUCH TESTS OR FOR ATTENDING UNIVERSITY ENTRANCE INTERVIEWS. 3.2 FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 3, PERSONS OF 'DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUND' MEAN PERSONS WHO SUFFER FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND INCLUDE, WITHOUT LIMITATION, PERSONS COMING FROM COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE LOW- AND MIDDLE-INCOME COUNTRIES THAT SUFFER FROM RACIAL AND/OR RELIGIOUS PERSECUTION, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) HAZARAS, TAMILS, KURDS, CHINESE INDONESIANS, ROHINGYAS AND ANY SUCH COMMUNITIES THAT THE CHARITY TRUSTEE MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME ("PERSECUTED COMMUNITIES"). 3.3 IN FURTHERING ITS OBJECTS, THE CIO SHALL GIVE PRIORITY TO PERSONS OF DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUND COMING FROM PERSECUTED COMMUNITIES, HOWEVER THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO SHALL NOT BE RESTRICTED TO ADVANCING EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS AND THE CIO SHALL BE ENTITLED TO FURTHER ITS OBJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS COMING FROM OTHER DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 Hawkeshead Road
MANCHESTER
M8 0QZ
- Phone:
- 07519675825
- Email:
- Uniarkfoundation@gmail.com
- Website:
-
UniArk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window