ABBEYFIELD AN LAC COMMUNITY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Abbeyfield An Lac Community (AAC) provides supported housing for persons of Vietnamese or Asian origin who are suffering from the disabilities of old age, or otherwise in need of care. It operates An Lac House, established in Cambridge in 1997, with 10 single en-suite rooms for residents. AAC also runs a free day centre, and organises cultural and religious events for the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 22 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trung Bui | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARY DIEM-AI WOODRUFF | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAN CROWTHER | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mai Ngoc Ward | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 THE RELIEF AND CARE OF PERSONS OF VIETNAMESE OR ASIAN ORIGIN LAWFULLY RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AND/OR THEIR SPOUSES, PARTNERS, WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS (“MEMBERS OF THE BENEFICIARY CLASS”) IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF HOUSING AND/OR RESIDENTIAL CARE HOMES, SHELTERED OR EXTRA SHELTERED ACCOMMODATION AND THE PROVISION OF CARE, SERVICES, AMENITIES AND/OR OTHER SUPPORT FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS; AND 3.1.2 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE AS THE CIO SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
An Lac House
280 Coldhams Lane
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3HN
- Phone:
- 01223246488
- Email:
- anlachouseuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window