WOOTTON COMMUNITY AND SPORTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to: Promote and expand amateur sport within Wootton by Woodstock Provide a welcoming and friendly social centre for Wootton residents and their guests, for recreation or other leisure time activities Support the young people of Wootton and the surrounding area, especially through leisure time activities Provide a bookable and affordable facility for private hire to all Wootton residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 06 April 2022: CIO registration
- WCAST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Gray | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Earle | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil John Pollard | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew William Mead | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Davies | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Sonia Mitchell-Boorne | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Neil Lawrence | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elaine Budge | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Keith Hemingway | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.70k | £33.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.98k | £48.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND PLAYING FIELD FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOOTTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR 3.1.1 MEETINGS, CLUBS AND CLASSES; AND 3.1.2 SPORT AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burditch Hall
Castle Road
Wootton
Woodstock
OX20 1EG
- Phone:
- 01993811474
- Email:
- woottoncast@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window