SEFTON PCF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run regular coffee morning and afternoon sessions, which are often attended by a guest speaker from Health, Education or the local authority. We also run events for parents three times a year, where they meet representatives from different organisations and get to speak to them in person and seek advice and support. We also attend strategic meetings with our local authority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £32,700 from 5 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sefton
Governance
- 14 July 2022: CIO registration
- SEFTON PARENT CARER FORUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Swinchin | Chair | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lesley Pickersgill | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Monica Theresa Wright | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yael Edmonds | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kellie Anne Wright | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.16k | £32.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.81k | £27.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.50k | £32.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, INCLUDING THEIR PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES, WHO HAVE DISABILITIES AND/OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS IN THE SEFTON AREA, IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE, PROMOTE THEIR INCLUSION IN THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND TO HELP AND SUPPORT THEM TO REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPCF Shared Space
Cambridge Family Wellbeing Hub
Cambridge Road
BOOTLE
Merseyside
L20 9LQ
- Phone:
- 07742881551
- Email:
- info@seftonpcf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window