BLUE LIGHT CARD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Blue Light community goes above and beyond for us every day, sometimes putting their own health and wellbeing in jeopardy. The Blue Light Card Foundation exists to empower all those who work, have worked, or volunteer in the Blue Light community. We give life-enhancing local and national projects the backing they need, through grants, to support the wellbeing of this incredible community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£1,364,892
Donations and legacies | £1.36m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£718,662
Raising funds | £48.15k | |
Charitable activities | £670.51k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £48.15k | |
Charitable expenditure | £670.51k | |
Retained for future use | £646.23k |
People

3 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 April 2022: CIO registration
- 09 August 2024: Funds received from 1167986 SAPPER SUPPORT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Jane Allison Hodgson | Chair | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Pavoni | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth James Whitehead | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Thomas Clegg | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Dalby | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHARLES DENNY | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £718.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.36m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £670.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £48.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £442.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.02k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £793.72k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £148.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 01 APR 2022 AMENDED ON 08 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF MEMBERS OF THE BLUE LIGHT COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOME OTHER IDENTIFIABLE CHARITABLE NEED, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CHARITABLE GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE THOSE NEEDS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE “BLUE LIGHT COMMUNITY” MEANS THE FOLLOWING GROUPS: AMBULANCE SERVICE (INCLUDING RETIRED STAFF), BLOOD BIKES, FIRE SERVICE (INCLUDING RETIRED FIREFIGHTERS), HIGHWAYS TRAFFIC OFFICERS, HM ARMED FORCES, HM ARMED FORCES VETERAN, HM COASTGUARD, HM PRISON AND PROBATION SERVICE, HOME OFFICE (BORDERS AND IMMIGRATION), INDEPENDENT LIFEBOATS, MOD CIVIL SERVANT, MOD FIRE SERVICE, MOD POLICE, NHS (INCLUDING RETIRED NHS), NHS DENTAL PRACTICE, PHARMACY, POLICE (INCLUDING RETIRED OFFICERS), RED CROSS, RESERVED ARMED FORCES, RNLI, SEARCH AND RESCUE, 4X4 RESPONSE, CAVE RESCUE, LOWLANDS SEARCH AND RESCUE, MINES RESCUE, MOUNTAIN RESCUE, SEARCH AND RESCUE, SOCIAL CARE, CARE COMPANY WORKFORCE, CARE HOME, COUNCIL (WORKING IN CARE SECTOR), FOSTER CARERS, RESIDENTIAL CARE, SOCIAL WORKER, ST ANDREWS AMBULANCE, AND ST JOHN AMBULANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLUE LIGHT CARD FOUNDATION
CHARNWOOD EDGE
SYSTON ROAD
COSSINGTON
LEICESTER
LE7 4UZ
- Phone:
- 03003732523
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window