THE THOMAS EXEMPLO DUCEMUS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust arose from the legacy of former Provost Marshal (Army) Brigadier Brian Thomas CBE who wished its income be spent on the Royal Military Police (RMP) on scholarships & bursaries; expeditions; grants to the RMP Museum & Church, memorial commemorations & festivals; aid research for histories etc; & activities fostering cooperation between international Military Police forces.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier Kristian Paul Rotchell | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant-Colonel William Iain Mackenzie-Watt | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Colin Andrew Findlay CBE | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY (?THE OBJECT?) IS THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL MILITARY POLICE (TO INCLUDE BOTH REGULAR AND RESERVE FORCES) AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE PROMOTION OF ESPRIT DE CORPS AND THE PRESERVATION OF THE HISTORY, DEEDS AND TRADITIONS OF THE ROYAL MILITARY POLICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RHQ RMP
The Old Stables (Postal Point 38)
SOUTHWICK PARK
FAREHAM
HAMPSHIRE
PO17 6EJ
- Phone:
- 02392284206
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window