Trustees PREOPERATIVE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1200997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Robert Hill Chair 01 June 2009
None on record
Dr Ciara Mitchell Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Dr Henry Murdoch Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Christine Reihill Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Dr Cathryn Eitel Trustee 01 June 2021
None on record
Claire Robards Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
Dr Simon Lewis Trustee
None on record
Anjna Patel Trustee
None on record