CENTRE CHURCH DROITWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The vision of Centre Church Droitwich is "to be committed to following Jesus, loving one another, and seeing lives changed in Droitwich." We are an independent church that is affiliated to the FIEC and partners with other evangelical churches in the region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 30 May 2022: CIO registration
- CENTRE CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN BARHAM | Chair | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Paul Free | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard Waters | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ovidiu Vaipan | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Thomas Putt | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richard Marshall | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.81k | £79.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.90k | £80.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 May 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN DROITWICH SPA AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 3.1.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE CHURCH HANDBOOK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 10 OAKLAND AVENUE
DROITWICH
WR9 7DD
- Phone:
- 07852242573
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window