Financial history HANDSWORTH JAM-E-MASJID AND ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 519657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £57.39k £53.91k £91.53k £67.39k £77.04k
Total expenditure £64.18k £47.89k £62.66k £63.67k £62.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.18k £8.22k N/A N/A