CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH, GRACE TABERNACLE INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian faith for the public benefit in accordance with the statement of faith throughout England & wales through holding of prayer meetings, Bible studies meeting as a forum, religious education, raising awareness of religious beliefs and practises, demonstrate the love of God supporting the needy, celebrating religious festivals, outreach and pastoral care in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 July 2022: CIO registration
- CAC, GRACE TABERNACLE INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ayodele Luwoye | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olayinka Lawal | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Akinniyi Kehinde Odesola | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Akintunde | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 389 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 389 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH THROUGHOUT ENGLAND & WALES THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, RAISING AWARENESS OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES, CELEBRATING RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH
GRACE TABERNACLE INTERNATIONAL
ST. MARYS PARISH CHURCH
HIGH ROAD
ILFORD
IG1 1TW
- Phone:
- 07985606209
- Email:
- Pastors.gracetab@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window