EZRA CENTRE FOR CHRISTIAN THOUGHT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OBJECTS The objects of the CIO (the Objects), which shall be carried out for the public benefit, are the advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the statement of faith in the Schedule, in particular but not exclusively by: (1) developing and delivering teaching programmes in Christian worldview and Christian apologetics, (2) developing and publishing works in an
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas John Pike | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Otto Jacobsson | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah-Jane Bentley | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Mark Leach | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (THE OBJECTS), WHICH SHALL BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING TEACHING PROGRAMMES IN CHRISTIAN WORLDVIEW AND CHRISTIAN APOLOGETICS, (2) DEVELOPING AND PUBLISHING WORKS IN ANY MEDIA. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION AUTHORISES THE APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 High Street
Standon
WARE
Hertfordshire
SG11 1LA
- Phone:
- 02045721374
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window