Trustees COTSWOLD BOATMOBILITY
Charity number: 1198949

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mattie Ross | Chair | 12 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Laura Maclennan | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Davies | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian White | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Rowland Creighton | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Neave Mitford-Slade | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Christine Thomas | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Howard Tibbitts | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.