Financial history THE WHITLEY BAY THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 519663
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £7.70k £24.75k £16.42k £21.88k £32.60k
Total expenditure £12.41k £20.64k £19.93k £21.38k £23.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A