Trustees WILTSHIRE BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1198735

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Butcher | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Caroline Meadows | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Pilz | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Green | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Alison Daniels | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Auty | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Leworthy | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Newell | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mark Bullock | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Joan Hobson | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Jennifer Banyard | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.