OXFORD ACADEMY OF INTERNATIONAL STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support for overseas students facing financial difficulties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- China
Governance
- 04 August 2022: CIO registration
- OAIS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Mullins | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Xuewei Ewei | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Huanchen Wang | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS BETWEEN 16 – 27 YEARS OLD IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD THROUGH BUT NOT LIMITED TO A. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN THE FORM OF GRANTS FOR ALL INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS 16 –27 YEARS OLD EXPERIENCING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP B. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PARTNERING ORGANIZATIONS SUCH AS UNIVERSITIES TOWARDS THE CREATION OF INTERNATIONAL STUDY PROGRAMS C. PROMOTING A MUTUAL CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL UNDERSTANDING D. COLLABORATIONS AND FOSTERING OF ACTIVE PARTNERSHIPS BETWEEN GLOBAL EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND ORGANIZATIONS, OTHER INTERNATIONAL BODIES AND/OR PROGRAMS, AND/OR OTHER INDIVIDUALS AND INTERESTED COMMUNITIES IN ORDER TO IMPROVE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION STANDARDS E. TO ENCOURAGE INTERNATIONAL EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL EXCHANGE IN ORDER TO RAISE THE INTERNATIONAL PROFILE OF EDUCATION DELIVERED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM F. THE SHARING OF INFORMATION BETWEEN EDUCATORS AND OTHERS IN SUCH COUNTRIES WITH THE EXPRESS PURPOSE OF IMPROVING EDUCATIONAL STANDARDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 LONGBOURN
WINDSOR
SL4 3TN
- Phone:
- 07860923133
- Email:
- ian.mullins@lvs.ascot.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window