SEVEN FRIENDS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seven Friends Foundation (registered charity number 1199444) provides small grants to organisations that support and promote causes that are ignored, unpopular or face widespread stigma, create stronger local communities that include those who have previously been excluded or marginalised, or improve skills, infrastructure, sustainability and collaboration within the the third sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Anne Wilkinson | Chair | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Keith Reynolds | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Noelani Tallulah Hall | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Freya Stone | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Alice Jacobs | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Alexandra Rose Allen | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert David Gallagher | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.01k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £19.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHARITABLE CAUSES THAT LACK POPULAR SUPPORT OR DO NOT RECEIVE PUBLIC ATTENTION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAKING GRANTS AND PROVIDING ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32A Sparsholt Road
LONDON
N19 4EL
- Phone:
- 07919513289
- Email:
- hello@sevenfriends.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window