THE CHRISTIAN PENTECOSTAL CHURCH OF WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of religion. Providing help and support to the needy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 12 January 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Catalano | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
IGNAZIO DIVINCENZO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GIUSEPPE SACCO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.88k | £8.50k | £9.89k | £8.23k | £12.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.13k | £3.76k | £3.07k | £2.55k | £4.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BY-LAWS ADOPTED 12TH JULY 1987.
Charitable objects
THE CHURCH IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR TO DO SO BY MEANS OF CORPORATE WORSHIP IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH AND THE ORDINANCES AND PRACTICES HEREINAFTER SET OUT AND SUBJECT TO THE POWERS AND PROVISIONS IN THIS CONSTITUTION CONTAINED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Silverbirch
Stourbridge Road
Wombourne
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV5 9BN
- Phone:
- 07796471805
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window