NEWBURY HISTORICAL STUDY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1198640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Newbury Historical Study Association is dedicated to the promotion of education in military history. It aims to organise educational events on military history subjects involving talks by individuals who are recognised as experts in the subject-matter, and by post-graduates who have carried out academic research in a range of different subjects relating to military history.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £116,433
Total expenditure: £48,801

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Marshall QC Chair 07 March 2022
None on record
Juan Emilio Amador Lozano Trustee 19 November 2023
None on record
Christopher Cornwell Trustee 07 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £107.75k £116.43k
Total expenditure £26.62k £48.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 16 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 16 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 SHEEN COMMON DRIVE
RICHMOND
TW10 5BN
Phone:
07946041733
Website:

No information available