SEARCH AND RESCUE ASSISTANCE IN DISASTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a specialist disaster response and humanitarian assistance charity that supports both domestic and international communities in times of need affected by disasters natural and man-made. We train and equip dedicated volunteers and members of the public to provide assistance and support to the emergency services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Algeria
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belize
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Bulgaria
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Czech Republic
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- Greece
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Japan
- Lebanon
- Libya
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Peru
- Philippines
- Romania
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Vietnam
Governance
- 23 May 2022: CIO registration
- SARAID (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rob Davis | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hurley | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Charles Cooper | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleuthera du Breuil MSc | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Woodward | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.62k | £128.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.70k | £29.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 May 2022
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE THROUGH: A. THE RAPID DEPLOYMENT OF EXPERIENCED VOLUNTEER PERSONNEL SUITABLY TRAINED AND EQUIPPED IN DISASTER RESPONSE TO PROVIDE ANY OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, URBAN SEARCH AND RESCUE, HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF. IT WILL OCCUR BETWEEN THE MOMENT OF THE NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE OCCURS AND THE POINT AT WHICH CONVENTIONAL DISASTER RELIEF ORGANISATIONS ARE ABLE TO RESPOND, AND ON AN ON-GOING BASIS IN ORDER TO SAVE, PROTECT AND PRESERVE HUMAN LIFE REGARDLESS OF RACE, COLOUR, RELIGION, GENDER OR POLITICAL PERSUASION; B. PROVIDING PERSONNEL TO SUPPORT WHERE NEEDED TO RESPONSE OF EMERGENCY SERVICES AND OTHER NATIONAL OR REGIONAL ORGANISATIONS TO SUCH OCCURRENCES; C. REDUCING RISKS ASSOCIATED WITH NATURAL DISASTERS, HUMANITARIAN CRISES OR CLIMATE CHANGE THROUGH THE DEPLOYMENT OF PERSONNEL TO TRAIN COMMUNITIES AND ORGANISATIONS TO MITIGATE AND INCREASE THEIR COPING CAPACITY AND RESILIENCE TO ANY FUTURE EVENTS; D. THE TRAINING OF VOLUNTEER PERSONNEL OR OTHERWISE BY USING THEIR SKILLS AND EXPERIENCE TO DELIVER HUMANITARIAN OPERATIONS AND PROGRAMS IN ORDER TO SUPPORT AND ENHANCE THEIR SKILLS DEVELOPMENT TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE. E. CARRYING OUT EARLY DAMAGE AND NEEDS ASSESSMENTS AND COORDINATION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD FOLLOWING ANY NATURAL DISASTER OR MAN-MADE CATASTROPHE THROUGH THE RAPID DEPLOYMENT OF VETTED, QUALIFIED, SKILLED, EXPERIENCED AND WELL EQUIPPED SPECIALIST STRUCTURAL ENGINEERING, MEDICAL AND/OR COORDINATION TEAMS COMPOSED IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT WHOLLY OF VOLUNTEER PERSONNEL, TO PROVIDE DISASTER RELIEF BETWEEN THE MOMENT A NATURAL DISASTER OR MAN-MADE CATASTROPHE OCCURS AND THE POINT AT WHICH CONVENTIONAL DISASTER RELIEF ORGANISATIONS OR LOCAL AUTHORITIES ARE ABLE TO RESPOND, AND ON AN ON-GOING BASIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SARAID
Fire Station
Station Road
Yate
BRISTOL
BS37 4AL
- Phone:
- 07970879913
- Email:
- enquiries@saraid.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window