AFRO CARIBBEAN MILLENIUM CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social Welfare Community Radio Meeting rooms for hire Research Unit Graphic Design
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
Governance
- 12 January 1988: Standard registration
- AFRO CARIBBEAN RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- AFRO CARRIBBEAN RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILLIP GEORGE MURPHY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN DALEY | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLY JOHNSON | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TYRRELL | Trustee | 09 April 2011 |
|
|||||
ALTON RUFUS BURNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHNATHAN DAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.64k | £121.41k | £49.36k | £48.31k | £67.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.50k | £98.92k | £57.98k | £108.32k | £107.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE BIRMINGHAM AND SANDWELL DISTRICT OF THE WEST MIDLANDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM, SANDWELL AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
339 DUDLEY ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B18 4HB
- Phone:
- 01214556382
- Email:
- info@acmccentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window