Accounts and annual returns MACCLESFIELD CRADLE CONCERN

Charity number: 519692
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 September 2018 222 days late
Annual return 31 March 2016 18 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 October 2015 On Time