AFRICAN & CARIBBEAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Welcoming Space, meaningful discussions and community gatherings where you can connect with others, shared experiences, Bi Weekly Luncheon Club, Enjoy delicious meals while fostering friendships and supporting each others well being. Community BBQs, Celebrate our culture, Educational Talks, inform on current events and issues that matter to our community through regular discussions.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 14 November 2023: CIO registration
- AFRICAN & CARIBBEAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (ACCA) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ludwig Ramsey | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Alan Croft | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Young | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN CHESTERFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF MEMBERS OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN COMMUNITIES (“BENEFICIARIES”) WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE BY: (A) PROVIDING CULTURALLY APPROPRIATE HEALTH INITIATIVES TO EDUCATE AND ADVISE ON ISSUES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO TYPE 2 DIABETES, SICKLE-CELL ANAEMIA, HYPERTENSION AND MENTAL ILL HEALTH WHICH DISPROPORTIONATELY AFFECT THE BENEFICIARIES; (B) DEVELOPING A CULTURALLY APPROPRIATE SITTING SERVICE TO OFFER RESPITE AND SUPPORT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CARERS OF BENEFICIARIES WHO SUFFER FROM CHRONIC HEALTH CONDITIONS AND DISABILITIES, TOGETHER WITH ANCILLARY SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO ASSIST THEM IN THEIR CARRYING OUT THEIR CARING ROLES; (C) PROVIDING ADVICE AND GUIDANCE TO DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICE PROVIDERS/ RELEVANT AGENCIES TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP AND PROVIDE CULTURALLY APPROPRIATE SERVICES AND REFERRAL PATHWAYS FOR BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE EXPERIENCING DOMESTIC ABUSE; (D) PROVIDING CULTURALLY APPROPRIATE PROJECTS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 30 FROM AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN COMMUNITIES WHICH RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS AND HELP THEM, DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (E) PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE BENEFICIARIES. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY STAGING ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS TO DEVELOP A GREATER UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN HISTORY, HERITAGE AND CULTURE. (3) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY: (I) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE; (II) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY (III) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (V) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. (4) THE PREVENTION OF HATE CRIME AND HARASSMENT, IN PARTICULAR THAT MOTIVATED BY RACE, AND THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY IT, IN PARTICULAR BY IMPLEMENTING SYSTEMS TO INCREASE REPORTING OF INCIDENTS TO THE POLICE AND WORKING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND THE POLICE TO DEVELOP MORE EFFECTIVE SERVICES IN THE REPORTING OF RACIALLY MOTIVATED HATE CRIME AND MEETING THE NEEDS OF THOSE AFFECTED BY IT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2 Penmore Business Centre
Hasland Road
Chesterfield
Derbyshire
S41 0SJ
- Phone:
- 01246208052
- Email:
- accachesterfield@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.