Trustees STAR HOUSING
Charity number: 1201684

Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharla Dandy | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Auguste | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|||||
James Hooper | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Blackmore | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Philpott | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Kingscote | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.