HARRY'S PALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Harrys Pals provides emotional support to parents of children who are severely ill or disabled. This is through the provision of counselling services, respite breaks and support through an online community of parents. Harrys Pals also campaigns for change to improve life for carers and people affected by disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNN MARIE STUBBS | Chair | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Christopher Roper | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carly Sumner Sinfield | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Carol Doyle | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norma Elizabeth Masters | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.71k | £97.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.29k | £92.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILY AND CARERS, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BADBY LODGE FARM
BADBY
DAVENTRY
NN11 3DD
- Phone:
- 07766518835
- Email:
- Julie.doyle@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
harryspals.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window