DERBY FOOD 4 THOUGHT ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Derby Food 4 Thought Alliance offers four types of provision. The provision offered will be based on the individual's personal circumstances and tailored to the level of support they require. We offer a co-ordinated model of - Emergency, Assistance, Community and other Initiative support, that will include advice, engagement, signposting to agencies and if required tailored specialist support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derby City
Governance
- 20 April 2022: CIO registration
- DF4T ALLIANCE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Whitney | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ejaz Sarwar | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Emma Fowler | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/04/2023 | 02/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £336.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £300.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 April 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN DERBY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLIES AND RELATED PROVISIONS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND TO OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS IN DERBY WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 CHARNWOOD STREET
DERBY
DE1 2GU
- Phone:
- 01332346266
- Email:
- info@df4ta.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window