WARSTOCK AND BILLESLEY DETACHED YOUTH WORK PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youthwise is a Detached Youth Work project working with young people in the Warstock and Billesley area of Birmingham. The organisation works closely with the police, local authority and other agencies to provide diversionary activities for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 14 January 1988: Standard registration
- 15 September 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 15 September 2014: Funds transferred to 1156830 THE WARSTOCK AND BILLESLEY DETACHED YOUTHWORK PROJ...
- YOUTHWISE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.26k | £147.06k | £90.68k | £14 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.46k | £145.88k | £121.05k | £622 | £14.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 23 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 27 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 27 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 21 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 21 September 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 13 SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 18 NOVEMBER 1994 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ORGANISATION IS TO HELP EDUCATE BOYS AND GIRLS AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE WARSTOCK/BILLESLEY AND SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD OF SOUTH BIRMINGHAM THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
WARSTOCK, BILLESLEY AND SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window