THE BRIAN NOLAN ART TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exhibiting the work of Brian Nolan in a wide range of galleries, museums and public collections, particularly, but not exclusively, in the Manchester and Peak District areas. Promoting participation in watercolour painting and an interest in the medium. Permitting images to be used as appropriate. Enabling access to digital images and original work for research and educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Susan Dean | Chair | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell Brian Andrew Dean | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Cooper | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Herbert Yardley | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Peter Brown | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Henley | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Nolan | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.67k | £7.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.68k | £7.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MAJOR COLLECTION OF ARTWORK BY THE ARTIST BRIAN NOLAN, THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED BY: 1. EXHIBITING HIS WORK IN A WIDE RANGE OF GALLERIES, MUSEUMS AND PUBLIC COLLECTIONS, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE MANCHESTER AND PEAK DISTRICT AREAS 2. PROMOTING PARTICIPATION IN WATERCOLOUR PAINTING AND AN INTEREST IN THE MEDIUM 3. PERMITTING IMAGES TO BE USED AS APPROPRIATE 4. ENABLING ACCESS TO DIGITAL IMAGES AND ORIGINAL WORK FOR RESEARCH AND EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILLOW VIEW CROOKED WAY
STEMBRIDGE
MARTOCK
SOMERSET
TA12 6BP
- Phone:
- 01460391423
- Email:
- briannolanartist@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window