THE GHANA AID FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Ghana
Governance
- 16 November 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KINGSLEY OWUSU | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DORCAS SALAMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR WILLIAM COFFIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENICE HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAVIS COFFIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED ON 24 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S MISSION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE FOR THE EXCLUSIVE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG GHANAIANS LIVING IN GHANA BY RELIEVING NEEDS ASSOCIATED WITH THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF INCREASED ACCESS TO HOUSING, EDUCATION, HEALTH, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT, MICRO-FINANCING, PHYSICAL EDUCATION, WOMEN’S EMPOWERMENT AND AGRICULTURAL PROJECTS. WE WILL ONLY FOCUS ON DELIVERING POSITIVE CHANGES FOR THE MOST MARGINALIZED AND IMPOVERISHED WHO ARE UNABLE TO SEEK OR RELY ON THE AID OR ASSISTANCE OF THE GHANAIAN GOVERNING AUTHORITIES. WE WILL OFFER FINANCIAL GRANTS AND FREE IMPARTIAL ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO OUR SERVICE USERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 SAMS LANE
WEST BROMWICH
B70 7EE
- Phone:
- 07909930558
- Email:
- princess.mavis@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window