THROCKLEY RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 17 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JESSIE TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL NELSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED 12 JULY 1993 AND 8 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE NEWBURN WARD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NEWBURN WARD (1982 BOUNDARY)
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 FINCHALE GARDENS
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE15 9HS
- Phone:
- 01912676466
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window