WARWICKSHIRE MINERS' WELFARE TRUST FUND SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust makes grants to those who work in, or have worked in, the coal mining industry and are suffering hardship, it also supports organisations in coalfield areas/communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 21 January 1988: Standard registration
- Warwickshire Miners Welfare Trust Fund (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BURKE | Chair | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE HASTELOW | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR GAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.43k | £14.28k | £12.28k | £12.36k | £13.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.82k | £9.04k | £7.13k | £5.35k | £7.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 NOVEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE HEALTH SOCIAL WELL BEING AND CONDITIONS OF LIVING OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLYED IN THE COAL INDUSTRY OF GREAT BRITAIN OR IN ACTIVITIES ALLIED TO THOSE OF THE SAID COAL INDUSTRY AND THEIR WIVES HUSBANDS AND DEPENDENT RELATIVES AND THE WIDOWS WIDOWERS AND NECESSITOUS RELATIVES OF DECEASED PERSONS WHO WERE IN THEIR LIFE TIME EMPLOYED AS AFORESAID AND WITH OTHER SIMILAR OBJECTS AS STATED IN THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION OF THEORGAINSATION.
Area of benefit
WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CISWO
WELFARE OFFICES
BERRY HILL LANE
MANSFIELD
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG18 4JR
- Phone:
- 01623625767
- Email:
- Pat.Charles@ciswo.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window