PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the physical or mental distress or poverty of persons with prostate cancer, the partners, families and friends of persons with prostate cancer and persons bereaved through prostate cancer. To help and support persons with prostate cancer and those who care for them, the partners, families and friends of persons with prostate cancer and persons bereaved through prostate cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 August 2022: CIO registration
- 03 July 2024: Funds received from 1092102 PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT NORTH WEST
- PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT NORTH WEST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Coleman | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Ormesher | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carthrine Moore | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE THE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS OR POVERTY OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER. (2) TO HELP AND SUPPORT PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER. (3) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND INFORMATION ABOUT PROSTATE CANCER TO PERSONS VULNERABLE TO AND WITH PROSTATE CANCER, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS VULNERABLE TO AND WITH PROSTATE CANCER, PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANSION HOUSE CHAMBERS
22 HIGH STREET
STOCKPORT
SK1 1EG
- Phone:
- 01614748222
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window