THE LEICESTER MUSEUMS AND GALLERIES DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1199639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support the purchase of artworks and the development of services that are of educational, scientific, artistic or cultural interest for the benefit of the inhabitants of the City of Leicester. Such purchases are presented to the Leicester City Museum and Arts service for addition to the city's Public Collections. We raise funds through public donations, bequests, and corporate partnerships.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £100
Total expenditure: £1,360

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 2022: CIO registration
  • 14 February 2025: Funds received from 527876 THE CITY OF LEICESTER MUSEUMS TRUST
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Michael Gilding Chair 13 July 2022
None on record
Dr Sally Horrocks Trustee 11 February 2023
None on record
Rita Bullivant Trustee 13 July 2022
THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND (CPRE) LEICESTERSHIRE
Received: On time
DE MONTFORT UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Received: On time
Ella Josephine Joyce Trustee 13 July 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £100
Total expenditure £0 £1.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 March 2024 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
City Hall
115 Charles Street
Leicester
LE1 1FZ
Phone:
01164543111