WEMMS EDUCATION UNLIMITED LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is established to operate a school for those with special educational needs.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 18 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa MacPherson | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michele Coleman | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Miller | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Booth | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 351 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 351 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 APR 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY OPERATING A SPECIAL SCHOOL TO BENEFIT CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO REQUIRE AN ALTERNATIVE LEARNING ENVIRONMENT WHERE PERSONAL AND ACADEMIC DEVELOPMENT HAVE EQUAL IMPORTANCE; AND (B) THE ASSISTANCE IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF LEARNING DIFFICULTY OR DISABILITY, OR SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF THE SAME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodstock House
Woodstock Lane North
Long Ditton
SURBITON
Surrey
KT6 5HN
- Phone:
- 01372276499
- Email:
- info@wemms.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window