SALAHADIN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdulkadr Omar Hamad | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Salahadin Abdulkadr Omar | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Ali Ahmed | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amir Qadir Maaruf | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Salar Sabir | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.27k | £10.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.17k | £10.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
1. ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF GENERAL PUBLIC THROUGHOUT THE UK MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF (A) PLACE OF WORSHIP, (B) RELIGIOUS EDUCATION BOTH ON-LINE AND ON-SITE, (C) HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND (D) CARRYING OUT OUTREACH WORK IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUFFERING OF PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN UK BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHES SHELTER OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
447 Mosley Rd
Birmingham
UK.
Salahadin Association
447 Mosl
- Phone:
- 07474738884
- Email:
- hamd_a36@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window