TAHIR ACADEMY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHILDRENS SUPPLEMENTARY CLASSESS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAYFUR RAHMAN | Chair | 02 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Syed MD Masud Ahmed | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mahfuj Ahmed | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/04/2023 | 02/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.83k | £41.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.76k | £35.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 April 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING EDUCATION IN BOTH MAINSTREAM AND ISLAMIC SUBJECTS AS A MEANS OF HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Oxeye Way
Edmonton
London
N18 2FP
- Phone:
- 07904873979
- Email:
- Sayfurrahman@live.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window