HELPING FAMILIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit to relieve the needs of individuals with a progressive disease (such as cancer, arthritis and dementia) and by extension their families and carers in particular but not exclusively by the provision of: - Assistance and support with shopping, cleaning and other day to day tasks. - Counselling sessions and support groups. - Targeted grants to families where family members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 01 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammad Nasir | Chair | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHEHRYAR AZHAR | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayesha Khalil FACP | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mir Durriya Zarrar MSc | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Waqas Zafar Malik | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS WITH A PROGRESSIVE DISEASE (SUCH AS CANCER, ARTHRITIS AND DEMENTIA) AND BY EXTENSION THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF: - ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT WITH SHOPPING, CLEANING AND OTHER DAY TO DAY TASKS. - COUNSELLING SESSIONS AND SUPPORT GROUPS. - TARGETED GRANTS TO FAMILIES WHERE FAMILY MEMBERS ARE FINANCIALLY DEPENDENT ON THE LOVED ONE WHO IS GOING THROUGH PROGRESSIVE DISEASE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Buckleigh Avenue
LONDON
SW20 9LD
- Phone:
- 07778820761
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window