THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S WALSALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We're an inner-city church seeking to bring Hope & Transformation through the good news about Jesus to the Community, College & Centre of Walsall, West Midlands. Details of all activities can be found on our website www.stpeterswalsall.org/
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Walsall
Governance
- 24 May 2022: Standard registration
- ST PETER'S WALSALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Louise Gray | Chair | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Wilkes | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Athina Uhuru Hatzis | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Emma Louise Hazel Holton | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anton Baker | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Frances Blount | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lucinda Hardwick | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Ann Gilbert | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Jacqueline Baker | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Blount | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Roger Turner | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Butau | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Caygill | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.12k | £68.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £331.44k | £76.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.42k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Peter's Church
STAFFORD STREET
WALSALL
WS2 8DX
- Phone:
- 01922645423
- Email:
- info@stpeterswalsall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window