GEORGETOWN DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity Activities are held at Georgetown Community Centre only.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 September 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Blaenau Gwent
Governance
- 08 March 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Owen | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Catherine Louise Penny | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Karl Jason Owen | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Bethan Rees | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Helen Simmonds | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Leanne Evans | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Merle Abu-Kaoud | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
FARID ABU-KAOUD | Trustee | 11 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/09/2018 | 27/09/2019 | 27/09/2020 | 27/09/2021 | 27/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.02k | £6.44k | £12.34k | £400 | £80 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.58k | £8.70k | £4.93k | £3.42k | £2.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days | |
Annual return | 27 September 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 September 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 September 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED 16 JUNE 1987
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GEORGETOWN AND THE NEIGHOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATINS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
GEORGETOWN AND THE NEIGHOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Georgetown Community Centre
James Street
Tredegar
NP22 3JE
- Phone:
- 07980838645
- Email:
- farid.abu-kaoud@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window