THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WERBURGH, CHORLTON-CUM-HARDY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We're a church wanting to play our part in seeing people, communities and churches come alive in Jesus' name in Chorlton, Manchester and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
47 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 08 June 2022: Standard registration
- ST WERBURGH'S CHURCH, CHORLTON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Frederick Charles Neal | Chair | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Burt | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Whitaker | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Christopher Reeves | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Joyce Clarke | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andy Bird | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Hawkins | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Quaintrell | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Cooper | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Hawkins | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £639.86k | £211.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £617.73k | £210.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £616.79k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £16.26k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.18k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £330 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £2.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £617.73k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. WERBURGHS CHURCH
386 WILBRAHAM ROAD
MANCHESTER
M21 0UH
- Phone:
- 01619894923
- Email:
- hello@stwchorlton.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window